Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 05/06/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/06/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14]* 05/06/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/19/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/19/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/19/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/19/2010
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 05/19/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 05/19/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/19/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/19/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/19/2010
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 05/19/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/19/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 05/19/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/29/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/30/2010
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 07/13/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/19/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/19/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 07/19/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 07/19/2010