Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/18/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 05/18/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/18/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/26/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/17/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/01/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/15/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/16/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/28/2010