Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 05/18/2010
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/18/2010
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2]* 05/18/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 05/18/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/20/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/20/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 05/25/2010
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 06/08/2010
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 06/22/2010
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 06/22/2010
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/22/2010
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 06/28/2010
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/19/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/19/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/19/2010
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 07/19/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/19/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 07/19/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/19/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/19/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/20/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/21/2010