There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Finding that holding the 2011 Major League Baseball All-Star Game in Arizona is at odds with Major League Baseball's efforts to promote diversity and tolerance, and urging Major League Baseball to find a more suitable location for the Game.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/18/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
05/18/2010Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
05/18/2010Introduced in House

Cosponsors (37)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/24/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/26/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/28/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/28/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/28/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 05/28/2010
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/28/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/28/2010
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 05/28/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/28/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/28/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/28/2010
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/28/2010
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/28/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/28/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 05/28/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/28/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/28/2010
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/28/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/28/2010
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/28/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/28/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/28/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/28/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/28/2010
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/28/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/28/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/28/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/28/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/28/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 05/28/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/23/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/29/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/13/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/15/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/15/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce05/18/2010 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.1370.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.1370. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/18/2010)

Urges Major League Baseball to find a more suitable location than Phoenix for its All-Star Game, should Arizona Senate Bill 1070 remain in effect.