Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/24/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/26/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/28/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/28/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/28/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 05/28/2010
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/28/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/28/2010
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 05/28/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/28/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/28/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/28/2010
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/28/2010
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/28/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/28/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 05/28/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/28/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/28/2010
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/28/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/28/2010
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/28/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/28/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/28/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/28/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/28/2010
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/28/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/28/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/28/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/28/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/28/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 05/28/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/23/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/29/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/13/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/15/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/15/2010