Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 05/19/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/19/2010
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 05/19/2010
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 05/19/2010
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 05/19/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 05/19/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 05/26/2010
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/27/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/27/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/28/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/27/2010
Rep. Djou, Charles K. [R-HI-1] 08/10/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/14/2010