Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 05/19/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 05/19/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/19/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 05/19/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 05/19/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 05/19/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 05/19/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 05/19/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 05/19/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 05/19/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4]* 05/19/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/19/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 05/19/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/19/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 05/19/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 05/19/2010
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 05/19/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 05/19/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 05/19/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 05/19/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 05/19/2010
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 05/19/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 05/19/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 05/19/2010
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 05/19/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 05/19/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/28/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/28/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/28/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/10/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/10/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/10/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/10/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/24/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/24/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/14/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 07/14/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/14/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 07/14/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/14/2010
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/14/2010