Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 05/19/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/15/2010
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 09/15/2010
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/15/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/15/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 09/16/2010
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 09/16/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/16/2010
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 09/16/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/16/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 09/16/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/16/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/16/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/16/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/16/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 09/16/2010
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 09/16/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 09/16/2010
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 09/16/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 09/16/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 09/16/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 09/16/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/16/2010
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/16/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/16/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/16/2010
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 09/16/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/20/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/22/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/22/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/22/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/22/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/22/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/22/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/22/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/22/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/22/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 09/22/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 09/29/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/29/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/29/2010
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/29/2010
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/29/2010
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 12/14/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 12/14/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 12/14/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 12/14/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 12/15/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/15/2010
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 12/15/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 12/15/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 12/15/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 12/15/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 12/15/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 12/15/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 12/16/2010
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 12/16/2010