Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/20/2010
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 05/20/2010
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 05/24/2010
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/24/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/24/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/24/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/24/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/24/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/28/2010
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/28/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/16/2010
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/22/2010
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 06/22/2010
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 07/01/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/20/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/20/2010