There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Recognizing and honoring the courage and sacrifice of the members of the Armed Forces and veterans, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
05/26/2010Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 414 - 0 (Roll no. 303).(text: CR 5/25/2010 H3778-3779)
05/20/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date
05/26/2010-6:25pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/26/2010-6:25pmOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 414 - 0 (Roll no. 303). (text: CR 5/25/2010 H3778-3779)
05/26/2010-6:17pmConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3838)
05/25/2010-4:40pmAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
05/25/2010-4:20pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 1385.
05/25/2010-4:20pmConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3778-3781)
05/25/2010-4:20pmMr. Skelton moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
05/20/2010Referred to House Veterans' Affairs
05/20/2010Referred to House Armed Services
05/20/2010Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/20/2010Introduced in House

Cosponsors (65)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 05/20/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 05/24/2010
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/24/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/24/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 05/24/2010
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/24/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 05/24/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/24/2010
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 05/24/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 05/24/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/24/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/24/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/24/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/24/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/24/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/24/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 05/24/2010
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/24/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 05/24/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/24/2010
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/24/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/24/2010
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/24/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/24/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/24/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 05/24/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/24/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/24/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/24/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/24/2010
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/24/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 05/24/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/24/2010
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 05/24/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/24/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/24/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 05/24/2010
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/24/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 05/24/2010
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 05/24/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 05/24/2010
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 05/24/2010
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 05/24/2010
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 05/24/2010
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 05/24/2010
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 05/24/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 05/24/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/24/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/24/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 05/24/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/24/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/24/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 05/24/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/24/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/24/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 05/24/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/24/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/24/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/24/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/24/2010
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/24/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/24/2010
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 05/25/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 05/25/2010
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 05/26/2010

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services05/20/2010 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs05/20/2010 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.1385.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.1385. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (05/26/2010)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Recognizes and honors the courage and sacrifice of the members of the Armed Forces and veterans and thanks such members and veterans for their service.

Urges all Americans to do the same.