Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/25/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 05/25/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/25/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/26/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/28/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/09/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/15/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/22/2010