Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 05/26/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 05/26/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 05/26/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/26/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 05/26/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 05/26/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 05/26/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/26/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 05/26/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 05/26/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/26/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 05/26/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large]* 05/26/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/26/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25]* 05/26/2010
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/10/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 06/10/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 06/10/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/16/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 06/30/2010
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/13/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/13/2010
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/13/2010
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 07/13/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/13/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/13/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/15/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/19/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/19/2010
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 07/19/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/21/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/22/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/29/2010
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 08/10/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/14/2010
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/14/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/14/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/14/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/15/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/29/2010
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 11/29/2010
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 11/30/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 11/30/2010