Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 05/28/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/28/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/28/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/08/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/08/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/08/2010
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/08/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/08/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 06/08/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/08/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/08/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/17/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/17/2010
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/17/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/22/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/22/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/23/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/23/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/24/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/24/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/24/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/24/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/24/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/29/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/29/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/29/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/30/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 06/30/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 06/30/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/13/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/13/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/14/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 07/19/2010
Rep. Djou, Charles K. [R-HI-1] 07/20/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/22/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/14/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/14/2010
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 09/23/2010