There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Congratulating the Chicago Blackhawks on winning the 2010 Stanley Cup Championship.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
06/29/2010Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 395 - 5, 1 Present (Roll no. 396).(text: CR 6/28/2010 H4885)
06/14/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date
06/29/2010-11:10amMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/29/2010-11:10amOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 395 - 5, 1 Present (Roll no. 396). (text: CR 6/28/2010 H4885)
06/29/2010-11:03amConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4909-4910)
06/28/2010-2:48pmAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
06/28/2010-2:39pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 1439.
06/28/2010-2:39pmConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4885-4886)
06/28/2010-2:39pmMs. Norton moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
06/17/2010Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
06/17/2010Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/14/2010Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
06/14/2010Introduced in House

Cosponsors (55)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 06/14/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/15/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/15/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/15/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 06/15/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/15/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/15/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/15/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/15/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/15/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 06/15/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/15/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 06/15/2010
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/15/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/15/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 06/15/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 06/15/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 06/15/2010
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/15/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/15/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/15/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/15/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/15/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/15/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/15/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/15/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/15/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 06/15/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/15/2010
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 06/15/2010
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/16/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/16/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/16/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/16/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform06/14/2010 Referred to
06/17/2010 Markup by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.1439. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (06/29/2010)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Congratulates the Chicago Blackhawks for winning the 2010 Stanley Cup Championship.