Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 06/15/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/01/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/01/2010
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/01/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/01/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/01/2010
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 07/01/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/15/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/15/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/15/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 07/15/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/15/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/15/2010
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/15/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/15/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/15/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/15/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/15/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/15/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 07/15/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 07/15/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/15/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/29/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/30/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/30/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/30/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/30/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/30/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/30/2010
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 07/30/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/30/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/30/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/30/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/30/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 08/10/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 08/10/2010
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/15/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/15/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/15/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/15/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/15/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/15/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/15/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/15/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/15/2010
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 09/22/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/22/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 09/29/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/17/2010
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 11/17/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 11/17/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/17/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/17/2010
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 11/17/2010
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 11/17/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/17/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/17/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 11/17/2010
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 12/01/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/01/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/01/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 12/01/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 12/01/2010
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 12/01/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 12/01/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 12/01/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 12/01/2010