Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 02/23/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 02/23/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 02/23/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 02/23/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/23/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/23/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/23/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/23/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/25/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 02/25/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 02/25/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/25/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/25/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/25/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 02/25/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/25/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 02/25/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/25/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/25/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/25/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/25/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/25/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/25/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/25/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/25/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 02/25/2009
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 03/02/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/02/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/02/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 03/02/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/02/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/02/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/02/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 03/02/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 03/02/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/02/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/02/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/02/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/02/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/03/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/03/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/05/2009