Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/30/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/22/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 12/14/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 12/14/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 12/14/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 12/14/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 12/15/2010
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 12/15/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 12/15/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 12/16/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 12/16/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 12/16/2010
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 12/16/2010
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 12/16/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 12/16/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 12/17/2010
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 12/17/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/17/2010