Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 06/22/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/30/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/15/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 09/15/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/15/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 09/16/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/22/2010
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 12/14/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 12/14/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 12/14/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 12/14/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 12/14/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 12/14/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 12/14/2010
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 12/14/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 12/15/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 12/15/2010
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 12/15/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 12/15/2010
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 12/15/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 12/16/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 12/16/2010
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 12/16/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 12/16/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/16/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 12/16/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 12/16/2010
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 12/16/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 12/16/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/16/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 12/16/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 12/17/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 12/17/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 12/17/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/17/2010