Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 06/22/2010
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 06/22/2010
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 07/30/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/15/2010
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 09/15/2010
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/22/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/22/2010
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/29/2010
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 12/14/2010
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 12/14/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 12/15/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 12/15/2010
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 12/16/2010
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 12/16/2010
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45] 12/17/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 12/17/2010