There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Supporting the goals and ideals of Railroad Retirement Day.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
07/20/2010Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5746-5747)
07/15/2010Reported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 111-544.
06/22/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date All Actions
07/20/2010-3:03pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/20/2010-3:03pmOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5746-5747)
07/20/2010-2:33pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 1463.
07/20/2010-2:33pmConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5746-5751)
07/20/2010-2:33pmMs. Brown, Corrine moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
07/15/2010Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 219.
07/15/2010Reported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 111-544.
07/01/2010Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials Discharged.
07/01/2010Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
07/01/2010Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/23/2010Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
06/22/2010Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
06/22/2010Introduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Transportation and Infrastructure06/22/2010 Referred to
07/01/2010 Markup by
07/15/2010 Reported by H. Rept. 111-544
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials06/23/2010 Referred to
07/01/2010 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.Res.1463. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (07/20/2010)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Supports the goals and ideals of Railroad Retirement Day as designated by the Railroad Retirement Board.

Recognizes the important contributions that the rail industry, rail workers, and retirees make to the national transportation system.

Urges the people of the United States to recognize such a day as an opportunity to celebrate the importance of the railroad retirement system to America's working families.