There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Supporting the United States Paralympics, honoring the Paralympic athletes, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
09/30/2010Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR 9/28/2010 H7034-7035)
06/25/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date
09/30/2010-12:31amMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/30/2010-12:31amOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR 9/28/2010 H7034-7035)
09/30/2010-12:31amConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7378)
09/28/2010-3:01pmAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Bilbray objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
09/28/2010-2:55pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 1479.
09/28/2010-2:55pmConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7034-7035)
09/28/2010-2:55pmMs. Chu moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
07/28/2010Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
07/28/2010Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/25/2010Referred to House Foreign Affairs
06/25/2010Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
06/25/2010Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
06/25/2010Introduced in House

Cosponsors (57)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26]* 06/25/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 06/25/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 06/25/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 06/25/2010
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 06/25/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 06/25/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 06/25/2010
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 06/25/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 06/25/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/01/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/01/2010
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 07/01/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 07/01/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/01/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/19/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 07/19/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 07/19/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/26/2010
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 07/26/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 07/26/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/26/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/26/2010
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/26/2010
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 07/26/2010
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/26/2010
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 07/26/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 07/26/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/26/2010
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 07/27/2010
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/27/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/27/2010
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/27/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/27/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/27/2010
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/27/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/27/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 07/27/2010
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 07/27/2010
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 07/27/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 07/27/2010
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/27/2010
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 07/27/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/27/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 07/27/2010
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/27/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/27/2010
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/27/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/27/2010
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 07/27/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 07/27/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/27/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/27/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/27/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 07/27/2010
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 07/29/2010
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 07/29/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 08/10/2010

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform06/25/2010 Referred to
07/28/2010 Markup by
House Foreign Affairs06/25/2010 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.1479.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.1479. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (09/30/2010)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Expresses support for the work of the United States Paralympics.

Congratulates all of the U.S. Paralympic Team medal winners from the 2010 Winter Paralympic Games in Vancouver, British Columbia, honors all of the athletes for their contributions to the Games, and recognizes the contributions of the athletes' families, schools, and communities to the Games and the U.S. Team.