There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Congratulating the champion, finalists, and all other participants in the 83rd Annual Scripps National Spelling Bee.

Actions Overview (2)

11/16/2010 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7468)
06/30/2010 Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

11/16/2010-3:32pm Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/16/2010-3:32pm On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7468)
11/16/2010-3:25pm DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 1494.
11/16/2010-3:25pm Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7468-7469)
11/16/2010-3:25pm Ms. Norton moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
09/23/2010 Ordered to be Reported (Amended).
09/23/2010 Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/30/2010 Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
06/30/2010 Introduced in House

Cosponsors (52)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 06/30/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 06/30/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 06/30/2010
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 06/30/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 06/30/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 06/30/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 06/30/2010
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 06/30/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 06/30/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18]* 06/30/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/13/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/13/2010
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 07/13/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/13/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 07/14/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 07/14/2010
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 07/14/2010
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 07/14/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 07/14/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/15/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 07/15/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 07/15/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/15/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/15/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/15/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/15/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/19/2010
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 07/19/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/19/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/19/2010
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/19/2010
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 07/20/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/20/2010
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 07/20/2010
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 07/21/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 07/21/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 07/26/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/26/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/26/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/26/2010
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 07/30/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/30/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/30/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/30/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/30/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/30/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/30/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/30/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/30/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/30/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 08/10/2010
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 08/10/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform06/30/2010 Referred to
09/23/2010 Markup by

No related bill information was received for H.Res.1494.

Subjects (4)

  • Congressional tributes
  • Elementary and secondary education
  • Language arts

Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.1494. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (11/16/2010)

Congratulates all the contestants of the 83rd Annual Scripps National Spelling Bee.

Recognizes the dedication and achievement of competition winner Anamika Veeramani and the other finalists, Adrian Gunawan, Elizabeth Platz, Shantanu Srivatsa, Laura Newcombe, Lanson Tang, Joanna Ye, and Andrew Grose.