Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 06/30/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 07/13/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/19/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/29/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/29/2010
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/29/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/29/2010
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 07/29/2010
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/29/2010
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 07/30/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/30/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/30/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 07/30/2010