Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 07/15/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 07/20/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 09/15/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/15/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/16/2010
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 11/16/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 11/16/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 11/29/2010