There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Honoring the achievements of Dr. Robert M. Campbell, Jr., to provide children with lifesaving medical care.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
07/28/2010Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6192-6193)
07/01/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
07/28/2010-1:08pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/28/2010-1:08pmOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6192-6193)
07/28/2010-12:57pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 1499.
07/28/2010-12:57pmConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6192-6194)
07/28/2010-12:57pmMr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
07/01/2010Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
07/01/2010Introduced in House

Cosponsors (114)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/15/2010
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/15/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/15/2010
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 07/15/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/15/2010
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/15/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 07/15/2010
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/15/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/15/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/21/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/21/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/21/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/21/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 07/21/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/22/2010
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/22/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/22/2010
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/22/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/22/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/22/2010
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 07/22/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 07/22/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/22/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 07/22/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 07/22/2010
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/22/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/22/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 07/22/2010
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/22/2010
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 07/22/2010
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 07/22/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/22/2010
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 07/22/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/22/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 07/22/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/22/2010
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 07/22/2010
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 07/22/2010
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 07/22/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/22/2010
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 07/22/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/22/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 07/22/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/22/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/22/2010
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 07/22/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/22/2010
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/22/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 07/22/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/22/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/22/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 07/22/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/22/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/22/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/22/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 07/22/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 07/22/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 07/22/2010
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 07/22/2010
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 07/22/2010
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/22/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 07/22/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/22/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/22/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/22/2010
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/22/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/22/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 07/22/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/22/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/22/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/22/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/22/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/22/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/22/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/22/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/22/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/22/2010
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 07/26/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 07/26/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/26/2010
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 07/26/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/26/2010
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 07/26/2010
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 07/26/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/26/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 07/26/2010
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 07/26/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/26/2010
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 07/26/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 07/26/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 07/26/2010
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 07/26/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 07/26/2010
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 07/26/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/26/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/26/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 07/26/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 07/26/2010
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 07/26/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 07/26/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 07/26/2010
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 07/26/2010
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 07/26/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT-5] 07/26/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/26/2010
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/26/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 07/26/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 07/26/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 07/26/2010
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 07/26/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 07/26/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/26/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/26/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/26/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce07/01/2010 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.1499.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.1499. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (07/28/2010)

Honors Dr. Robert Campbell for his lifelong devotion to children's health care. Congratulates Dr. Campbell and his colleagues on their extraordinary achievement in pediatric and orthopedic innovation.

Recognizes the Vertical Expandable Prosthetic Titanium Rib device which has saved the lives of many infants and children.