Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/28/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/28/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 07/28/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/28/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/28/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/28/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/28/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/28/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/28/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/28/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/28/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/28/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/28/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/28/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/28/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/28/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/28/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/28/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/28/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/28/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/28/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/28/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/28/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/28/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/28/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/29/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/30/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 08/10/2010
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 08/10/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 08/10/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 09/14/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/14/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/15/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/22/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/15/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 11/15/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/15/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/15/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/15/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 11/15/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 11/17/2010