Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/21/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/22/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 09/22/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/22/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/22/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/22/2010
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 09/22/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 09/22/2010
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 09/22/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/22/2010
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/22/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/22/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/28/2010
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/28/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/28/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 09/28/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/28/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 09/28/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/28/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 09/28/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/28/2010
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/28/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/28/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/28/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/29/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/29/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 09/29/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 09/29/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/29/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/29/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/29/2010
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 11/17/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 11/17/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 11/17/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/17/2010
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 11/17/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/17/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 11/17/2010
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 11/17/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/17/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 11/18/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 11/18/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 11/18/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 11/18/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/18/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/18/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 11/18/2010
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 11/18/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/18/2010
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 11/18/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 11/18/2010
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 11/29/2010
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 12/02/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 12/02/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 12/02/2010