There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Congratulating the Washington Stealth for winning the National Lacrosse League Championship.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
09/30/2010Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR 9/28/2010 H7034)
07/21/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date
09/30/2010-12:31amMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/30/2010-12:30amOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR 9/28/2010 H7034)
09/30/2010-12:30amConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7378)
09/28/2010-2:54pmAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Bilbray objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
09/28/2010-2:51pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 1546.
09/28/2010-2:51pmConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7034)
09/28/2010-2:51pmMs. Chu moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
07/28/2010Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
07/28/2010Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/21/2010Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
07/21/2010Introduced in House

Cosponsors (55)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 07/21/2010
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 07/21/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 07/21/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/21/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 07/21/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 07/22/2010
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/22/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 07/26/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 07/28/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/28/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/30/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform07/21/2010 Referred to
07/28/2010 Markup by

No related bill information was received for H.Res.1546.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.1546. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/30/2010)

Congratulates the Washington Stealth for winning the National Lacrosse League Championship.