Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 07/30/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/30/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/14/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/29/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 12/07/2010