Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 07/30/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/23/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 09/23/2010
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 09/23/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/23/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 09/23/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/23/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/23/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/23/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 09/23/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 09/23/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/23/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 09/23/2010
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 09/23/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 09/23/2010
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 09/23/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 09/23/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 09/23/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/23/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/23/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 09/23/2010
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 09/23/2010
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/23/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/23/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/23/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/23/2010
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/23/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 09/23/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/23/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/23/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 09/23/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 09/23/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/23/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/23/2010
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 09/23/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/23/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/23/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 09/23/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/23/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 09/23/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/23/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/23/2010
Rep. Djou, Charles K. [R-HI-1] 11/17/2010
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 11/17/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 11/17/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 11/29/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 11/29/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 11/29/2010
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 11/29/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 11/29/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 11/29/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/29/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 11/29/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 11/29/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 11/29/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 11/29/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 11/29/2010
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 11/29/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/29/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 11/29/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 11/29/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 11/30/2010