Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/14/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/14/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/14/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 09/14/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/14/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/14/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/14/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 09/14/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/14/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/14/2010
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/14/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/14/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/14/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/14/2010
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 09/14/2010
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/14/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 09/14/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/14/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/14/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/14/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/14/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/14/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/14/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/14/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/14/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/14/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/14/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/14/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/14/2010
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/14/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/14/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/14/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/14/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/14/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/14/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/14/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 09/14/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/15/2010
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 09/15/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/15/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/15/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/15/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/15/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/15/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/15/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/15/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/16/2010
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/16/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/16/2010
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/16/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/22/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 09/22/2010
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/22/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/22/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 09/22/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/22/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/23/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 09/23/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/23/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/23/2010
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 09/28/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/28/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/28/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 09/28/2010