Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 02/11/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/02/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/02/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 04/30/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/30/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/30/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/30/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/30/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/21/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/21/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/21/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 06/10/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/10/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/10/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/23/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/16/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 09/16/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/16/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/16/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 09/16/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 09/16/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 09/16/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 09/21/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/21/2009
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 09/25/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/25/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/25/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/25/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/29/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 09/29/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/29/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/29/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 09/29/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 10/01/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 10/01/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 10/01/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/01/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 10/01/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/01/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/01/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/06/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/06/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/06/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 10/06/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 10/06/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/06/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/06/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/06/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 10/06/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/06/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/06/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/06/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/06/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/06/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 10/06/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 10/07/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/08/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 10/20/2009