Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 01/06/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/20/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 09/22/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 09/22/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/22/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 09/22/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/22/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 09/22/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 09/22/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/22/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/22/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 09/22/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 09/22/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/22/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 09/22/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/22/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/22/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 09/22/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/22/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 09/22/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/22/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/22/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 09/22/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 09/22/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 09/22/2009
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 09/22/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/22/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/22/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 09/22/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/22/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/22/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 09/22/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 09/22/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 09/22/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 09/22/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/22/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/22/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/22/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/22/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/22/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/22/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/22/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/22/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 09/22/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/22/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 09/22/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 09/22/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 09/22/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/22/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 09/22/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 09/22/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/22/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/22/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 09/24/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/24/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 09/24/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 09/24/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/25/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/29/2009