Refine your search

Refined by:

Pennsylvania Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/15/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/22/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 09/28/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/28/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/28/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/29/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 11/15/2010