Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/15/2010
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/15/2010
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/15/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 09/15/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/15/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/15/2010
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 09/15/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 09/15/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/15/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 09/15/2010
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/15/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 09/22/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/22/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 09/22/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 09/22/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/22/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 09/28/2010
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 09/28/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 09/28/2010
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/28/2010
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 09/28/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 09/28/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 09/28/2010
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/29/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/29/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/29/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 11/15/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/15/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 11/15/2010