There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Recognizing the service of the medical and air crews in helping our wounded warriors make the expeditious and safe trip home to the United States and commending the personnel of the Air Force for their commitment to the well-being of all our service men and women.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
09/28/2010Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7002)
07/30/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date
09/28/2010-12:17pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/28/2010-12:17pmOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7002)
09/28/2010-12:11pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 1605.
09/28/2010-12:11pmConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7002-7003)
09/28/2010-12:11pmMr. Critz moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
09/16/2010Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
07/30/2010Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
07/30/2010Introduced in House

Cosponsors (76)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 07/30/2010
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 07/30/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Djou, Charles K. [R-HI-1]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 09/14/2010
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/14/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/14/2010
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/14/2010
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/14/2010
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/15/2010
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 09/15/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/15/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 09/15/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/15/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/15/2010
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 09/15/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 09/15/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/15/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 09/15/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 09/15/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 09/15/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/15/2010
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 09/15/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/15/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 09/15/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/15/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/15/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/15/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 09/15/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/15/2010
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 09/15/2010
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/15/2010
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/15/2010
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/15/2010
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 09/15/2010
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 09/15/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 09/23/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/23/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services07/30/2010 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel09/16/2010 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.1605.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.1605. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/28/2010)

Recognizes the service of the medical and air crews in helping our wounded warriors make the trip home.

Commends the personnel of the Air Force for their commitment to the well-being of all our service men and women.