Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/16/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 09/16/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/16/2010
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/16/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/16/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 09/16/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/16/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/20/2010
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/22/2010
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 09/22/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/22/2010
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/22/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 09/22/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/22/2010
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 09/22/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/22/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/22/2010
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 09/22/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 09/23/2010
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 09/23/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 09/23/2010
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/23/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 09/23/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/23/2010
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 09/23/2010
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/23/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/28/2010
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 09/28/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/29/2010
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 12/03/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 12/03/2010