Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2]* 09/15/2010
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1]* 09/15/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 09/15/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 09/15/2010
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 09/15/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 09/15/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 09/15/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 09/15/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/22/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/22/2010
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 09/22/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/22/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 09/22/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/22/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/22/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/22/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/22/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/22/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 09/22/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 09/23/2010
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/23/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/23/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/28/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/28/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 09/28/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/28/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/28/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 09/29/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/29/2010
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 09/29/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/29/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/29/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/29/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/29/2010
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 09/29/2010
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/29/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/15/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/02/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 12/02/2010
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 12/02/2010
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 12/02/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/02/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 12/02/2010
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 12/02/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 12/02/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 12/02/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 12/02/2010
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 12/02/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 12/02/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 12/02/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 12/02/2010
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 12/02/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 12/02/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 12/02/2010
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 12/02/2010
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 12/02/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 12/02/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 12/02/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/02/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 12/02/2010
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 12/02/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 12/02/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 12/02/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 12/02/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 12/02/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 12/02/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 12/02/2010
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 12/02/2010
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 12/02/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 12/02/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 12/02/2010
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 12/02/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 12/02/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/02/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 12/02/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 12/02/2010