Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 02/13/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/05/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/05/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/05/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/05/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/05/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/05/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/05/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/05/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/05/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/06/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/06/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/09/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 03/09/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/09/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 04/28/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 11/16/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 12/09/2009