There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Commemorating the Persian Gulf War and reaffirming the commitment of the United States towards Persian Gulf War veterans.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
11/17/2010Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7512)
09/28/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date
11/17/2010-6:24pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/17/2010-6:24pmOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7512)
11/17/2010-6:23pmDEBATE - The House concluded debate on H. Res. 1672.
11/17/2010-6:02pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 1672.
11/17/2010-6:02pmConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7512-7515)
11/17/2010-6:02pmMs. Watson moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
10/20/2010Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
09/28/2010Referred to House Veterans' Affairs
09/28/2010Referred to House Armed Services
09/28/2010Referred to House Foreign Affairs
09/28/2010Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/28/2010Introduced in House

Cosponsors (38)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 09/28/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 09/28/2010
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 09/28/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 09/28/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 09/28/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12]* 09/28/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 09/28/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 09/28/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 09/28/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 09/28/2010
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 09/28/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 09/28/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 09/28/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 09/28/2010
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1]* 09/28/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 09/28/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 09/28/2010
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5]* 09/28/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20]* 09/28/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2]* 09/28/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 09/28/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 09/28/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 09/28/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 09/28/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 09/28/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 09/28/2010
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 09/28/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 09/28/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 09/28/2010
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 09/28/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 09/28/2010
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 09/28/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 09/28/2010
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2]* 09/28/2010
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 09/28/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 09/28/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 09/28/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/15/2010

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs09/28/2010 Referred to
House Armed Services09/28/2010 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel10/20/2010 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs09/28/2010 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.1672. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (11/17/2010)

Recognizes the 20th anniversary of the Persian Gulf War, which began on August 2, 1990.

Honors the service and sacrifice of the U.S. Armed Forces and armed forces of allied countries that served in the Persian Gulf since 1990 to the present.

Encourages all Americans to participate in commemorative activities to pay tribute to Persian Gulf War veterans.

Calls upon the President to issue a proclamation recognizing such anniversary.

Reaffirms the U.S. commitment to peace and prosperity in the Persian Gulf region.