Text: H.Res.1680 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Bill Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/29/2010)


111th CONGRESS
2d Session
H. RES. 1680

Recognizing the 15th anniversary of the Dayton Peace Accords.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
September 29, 2010

Mr. Turner (for himself and Mr. Delahunt) submitted the following resolution; which was referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs


RESOLUTION

Recognizing the 15th anniversary of the Dayton Peace Accords.

Whereas, on December 14, 1995, the General Framework Agreement for Peace in Bosnia and Herzegovina, known as the Dayton Peace Accords, ended a conflict that threatened to destabilize Europe and resulted in the death of approximately 250,000 people, and the displacement of more than 2,000,000 men, women, and children;

Whereas negotiations began on November 1, 1995, at Wright-Patterson Air Force Base in Dayton, Ohio, and concluded there on November 21, 1995, when the leaders of Bosnia and Herzegovina, Croatia, and Serbia all agreed to a breakthrough peace settlement that sought to halt conflicts that began in Bosnia and Herzegovina in April 1992;

Whereas previous attempts to negotiate peace in Bosnia and Herzegovina had been unsuccessful;

Whereas the negotiations were initiated under intense pressure by many of the world powers, particularly the United States and Russia, prompting the leaders of the three sides to attend the negotiations in Dayton, Ohio;

Whereas the United States negotiating team led by Ambassador Richard Holbrooke guided peace negotiations endorsed by members of the European Union (EU) and Russian Federation;

Whereas 21 days of intense negotiations occurring at the Hope Hotel at Wright-Patterson Air Force Base brought hope and an opportunity for peace;

Whereas the negotiations succeeded, against all predictions, due to the visionary leadership, the determination of all involved, the desire for peaceful resolution of the conflict, and the extensive community support;

Whereas Wright-Patterson Air Force Base was chosen as the site of the negotiations due to its diversity and security, which offered an environment where the warring parties could focus on negotiating peace out of the spotlight of the media and away from distracting geopolitical pressures;

Whereas the Dayton community unexpectedly became part of the process as its people became proud to be part of history, holding candlelight vigils, placing “candles of peace” in their front windows, congratulating and praying for the negotiators, forming a human peace chain around Wright-Patterson Air Force Base, and continuing to study peace and human rights based on the community’s experiences hosting these historic negotiations;

Whereas the negotiators highlighted Ohio’s ethnic diversity to show the warring parties that people from disparate ethnic histories could live everyday life in peace;

Whereas the Dayton Peace Accords provided a framework and common agreement to the North Atlantic Treaty Organization (NATO) implementation and stabilization force missions which provided security for the citizens of Bosnia and Herzegovina, Croatia, and Serbia;

Whereas the Dayton Literary Peace Prize, established in 2006, remains the only literary peace prize awarded in the United States, and continues the legacy of the 1995 Dayton Peace Accords by honoring authors who write about peace and whose work provides enduring literary value;

Whereas the Dayton International Peace Museum in downtown Dayton, a nonprofit, all-volunteer organization, is one of the few community-based institutions with a focus on peace in the United States, and the Museum honors Dayton's history as the host of the 1995 Dayton Peace Accords, offering nonpartisan educational programs and exhibits featuring themes of nonviolent conflict resolution, social justice issues, international relations, and peace;

Whereas the Dayton, Ohio, community supported the peace negotiations and worked to create a strong, lasting relationship with Bosnia and Herzegovina by hosting numerous visiting delegations, creating a sister city relationship with Sarajevo, and hosting an international anniversary commemoration;

Whereas Bosnia and Herzegovina has received a conditional Membership Action Plan to join NATO pending continued progress on reforms, and will deploy personnel with the International Security Assistance Force (ISAF) in the coming months;

Whereas Croatia is progressing on the path to join the EU, became a NATO member in 2009, and has deployed troops around the world, including in Afghanistan, fighting alongside the United States Armed Forces to bring peace, stability, and prosperity to others;

Whereas the Montenegrin Parliament declared independence from Serbia on June 3, 2006, and thus created a multi-ethnic country with a viable economy, professional military, and democratic institutions;

Whereas Serbia has recently cleared a major obstacle to EU integration by committing to negotiate with Kosovo on practical issues involving the two countries, and is making strong efforts to arrest the last two war crimes fugitives sought by the International Criminal Tribunal for the former Yugoslavia, Ratko Mladic and Goran Hadzic;

Whereas the entire State of Ohio has contributed to stability and prosperity in the Balkan region by fostering an exemplary relationship between the Ohio National Guard and the Serbian Armed Forces; and

Whereas the Dayton Peace Accords effectively ended the conflict, created a multi-ethnic country in the Balkans, and addressed topics critical to the future of Bosnia and Herzegovina, including regional stabilization, a constitutional framework, the repatriation of refugees, and internal security: Now, therefore, be it

Resolved, That the House of Representatives—

(1) commends Bosnia and Herzegovina for the significant progress it has made over the past 15 years on the implementation of the Dayton Peace Accords;

(2) welcomes and supports the aspiration of Bosnia and Herzegovina to become a member of the North Atlantic Treaty Organization (NATO);

(3) reaffirms the importance of the successful participation of Bosnia and Herzegovina in the European integration process for the future freedom and prosperity of its citizens;

(4) encourages the Government of Bosnia and Herzegovina to continue reforms on economic and constitutional issues; and

(5) recognizes the role of the State of Ohio as well as the Greater Dayton community in fostering and promoting the Dayton Peace Accords and its ideals, and continuing to support diplomacy, security, and peace around the world.