Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 11/16/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/16/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/16/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/16/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 11/16/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/16/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 11/16/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/16/2010
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 11/16/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 11/16/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/16/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 11/16/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/16/2010
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 11/16/2010
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 11/16/2010
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 11/16/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 11/16/2010
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 11/16/2010
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 11/16/2010
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 11/16/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 11/16/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 11/16/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/16/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 11/16/2010
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 11/16/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 11/16/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 11/16/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/16/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 11/16/2010
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 11/16/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 11/16/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 11/16/2010
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 11/16/2010
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 11/16/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 11/16/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/16/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 11/16/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/17/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/17/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 11/17/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 11/17/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 11/17/2010
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 11/17/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 11/17/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 11/17/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 11/17/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 11/17/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 11/17/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/17/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/17/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 11/17/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 11/17/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 11/17/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 11/17/2010
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 11/17/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 11/17/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 11/17/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 11/17/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 11/17/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 11/17/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 11/17/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 11/17/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 11/17/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 11/17/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/17/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/17/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 11/17/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/17/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 11/17/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/17/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 11/17/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 11/17/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 11/17/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 11/17/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 11/17/2010
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 11/17/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 11/17/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 11/17/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/17/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 11/17/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 11/17/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 11/17/2010
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 11/17/2010
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 11/17/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 11/17/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/17/2010
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 11/17/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 11/17/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 11/17/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 11/17/2010
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 11/17/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 11/17/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 11/17/2010
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 11/17/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 11/17/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 11/17/2010
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 11/17/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 11/17/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 11/17/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/17/2010
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 11/17/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 11/29/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 11/30/2010