Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 11/17/2010
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 11/17/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 11/17/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/30/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 11/30/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/07/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 12/07/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 12/07/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 12/08/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 12/09/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 12/16/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 12/21/2010