Text: H.Res.1731 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Bill Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/18/2010)


111th CONGRESS
2d Session
H. RES. 1731

Reaffirming Congressional opposition to the declaration of a Palestinian state, and for other purposes.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
November 18, 2010

Mr. Poe of Texas (for himself, Ms. Berkley, Mr. Weiner, and Ms. Ros-Lehtinen) submitted the following resolution; which was referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs


RESOLUTION

Reaffirming Congressional opposition to the declaration of a Palestinian state, and for other purposes.

Whereas a true and lasting peace between Israel and the Palestinians can only be achieved through direct negotiations between the parties;

Whereas the leadership of the Palestinian Authority (PA) and the Palestine Liberation Organization (PLO) have repeatedly refused to negotiate directly with the Government of Israel, demanding unprecedented preconditions from Israel in exchange for their return to direct negotiations;

Whereas Palestinian leaders have repeatedly threatened to unilaterally declare a Palestinian state and to seek recognition of a Palestinian state by the United Nations and other international forums;

Whereas Palestinian leaders are reportedly holding high-level discussions on pursuing recognition of a Palestinian state by the United Nations and other international forums;

Whereas UN Special Coordinator for the Middle East Peace Process Robert Serry on October 26, 2010, expressed his support for recognition of a Palestinian state by the United Nations;

Whereas, on March 11, 1999, the Senate adopted Senate Concurrent Resolution 5, and on March 16, 1999, the House of Representatives adopted House Concurrent Resolution 24, both of which resolved that “any attempt to establish Palestinian statehood outside the negotiating process will invoke the strongest congressional opposition.”;

Whereas Secretary of State Hillary Rodham Clinton stated on October 20, 2010, that “There is no substitute for face-to-face discussion and, ultimately, for an agreement that leads to a just and lasting peace.”;

Whereas Secretary Clinton stated on November 10, 2010, that “Negotiations between the parties is the only means by which all the outstanding claims arising out of the [Israeli-Palestinian] conflict can be resolved … So we do not support unilateral steps by either party that could prejudge the outcome of such negotiations.”;

Whereas, on November 10, 2010, the Israeli Knesset adopted a resolution “reject[ing] entirely the threats of some Palestinian leaders to declare unilateral Palestinian statehood … [affirming] that all points of dispute must be debated only within the framework of direct negotiations … [and] call[ing] on the Palestinian leadership to return to the negotiating table.”;

Whereas Prime Minister Benjamin Netanyahu of Israel, in a speech at Bar Ilan University in Israel on June 14, 2009, stated that “[A] fundamental prerequisite for ending the conflict is a public, binding and unequivocal Palestinian recognition of Israel as the nation state of the Jewish people … Therefore, today we ask our friends in the international community, led by the United States, for what is critical to the security of Israel: Clear commitments that in a future peace agreement, the territory controlled by the Palestinians will be demilitarized … If we receive this guarantee regarding demilitarization and Israel's security needs, and if the Palestinians recognize Israel as the State of the Jewish people, then we will be ready in a future peace agreement to reach a solution where a demilitarized Palestinian state exists alongside the Jewish state.”;

Whereas efforts to bypass negotiations and to unilaterally declare a Palestinian state or to appeal to the United Nations or other international forums for recognition of a Palestinian state would clearly and fundamentally violate the underlying principles of the 1993 Oslo Accords and the Middle East peace process, and represent another instance of the Palestinian leadership's noncompliance with its commitments under existing agreements; and

Whereas United States opposition to any unilateral Palestinian declaration of statehood or related measures should be reaffirmed strongly and unequivocally: Now, therefore, be it

Resolved, by the House of Representatives that Congress—

(1) reaffirms its strong opposition to any attempt to establish a Palestinian state outside the negotiating process;

(2) strongly and unequivocally opposes any attempt to seek recognition of a Palestinian state by the United Nations or other international forums;

(3) calls upon the Administration to continue its opposition to the unilateral declaration of a Palestinian state;

(4) calls upon the Administration to affirm that the United States would deny any recognition, legitimacy, or support of any kind to any unilaterally declared “Palestinian state” and would urge other responsible nations to follow suit, and to make clear that any such unilateral declaration would constitute a grievous violation of the principles underlying the Oslo Accords and the Middle East peace process;

(5) calls upon the Administration to affirm that the United States will oppose any attempt to seek recognition of a Palestinian state by the United Nations or other international forums and will veto any resolution to that end by the United Nations Security Council;

(6) calls upon the President and the Secretary of State to lead a high-level diplomatic effort to encourage the European Union and other responsible nations to strongly and unequivocally oppose the unilateral declaration of a Palestinian state or any attempt to seek recognition of a Palestinian state by the United Nations or other international forums; and

(7) supports the resolution of the Israeli-Palestinian conflict and the achievement of a true and lasting peace through direct negotiations between the parties.