Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 11/29/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 11/29/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 11/29/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 11/29/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 11/29/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 11/30/2010
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 11/30/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 11/30/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 12/01/2010
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 12/01/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 12/01/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 12/01/2010
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 12/01/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 12/02/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 12/02/2010
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 12/02/2010
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 12/02/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 12/07/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 12/07/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 12/07/2010
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 12/07/2010
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 12/07/2010
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 12/07/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 12/07/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 12/07/2010
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 12/07/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 12/08/2010
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 12/08/2010
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 12/08/2010
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 12/08/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 12/08/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 12/14/2010
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 12/14/2010