Text: H.Res.1738 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Bill Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/29/2010)


111th CONGRESS
2d Session
H. RES. 1738

Expressing condolences to the people and Government of the Republic of China (Taiwan) and the people and Government of the Republic of the Philippines in the aftermath of Super Typhoon Megi which struck in October 2010.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
November 29, 2010

Mr. Burton of Indiana (for himself, Mr. Rohrabacher, Mr. Poe of Texas, Mr. Pierluisi, Ms. Bordallo, Mr. Payne, Ms. Berkley, Mr. Gingrey of Georgia, Mr. Wu, Mr. Lincoln Diaz-Balart of Florida, Mr. Connolly of Virginia, Ms. Jackson Lee of Texas, Mr. Mario Diaz-Balart of Florida, and Mr. Faleomavaega) submitted the following resolution; which was referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs


RESOLUTION

Expressing condolences to the people and Government of the Republic of China (Taiwan) and the people and Government of the Republic of the Philippines in the aftermath of Super Typhoon Megi which struck in October 2010.

Whereas Super Typhoon Megi was listed as a category 5 storm, the strongest storm to hit the northwest Pacific in 2 decades;

Whereas Typhoon Megi’s center made landfall on the Luzon island of the Philippines at 11:25 a.m. on October 18, 2010, causing torrential rains and flash floods;

Whereas over 32,902 persons were evacuated and 148,222 homes were damaged, including 30,048 homes that were completely destroyed;

Whereas Typhoon Megi cost approximately $11,000,000 in damages to infrastructure and $268,000,000 in agriculture damage, including damage to irrigation systems;

Whereas 31 individuals have been reported dead, 42 are injured, and 4 are still missing;

Whereas Typhoon Megi hit the island of Taiwan on October 21, 2010, causing rockslides, mudslides, and flash flooding throughout Yilan County in northeastern Taiwan;

Whereas Typhoon Megi broke all previous records, including the record set by Typhoon Morakot in 2009, with 37 inches of rainfall in a 24-hour period and just over 7 inches of rainfall in an hour;

Whereas the landslides caused more than 400 people to become stranded;

Whereas the Government of Taiwan dispatched 997 rescuers, helicopters, ships, and excavators to search for missing people and vehicles;

Whereas 36 people have been confirmed dead, including 19 tourists from mainland China who, along with their bus, appear to have been tragically washed out to sea;

Whereas Bai Yun Temple in Suao, Taiwan, collapsed killing 9 including 2 nuns;

Whereas, as of November 3, 2010, the total amount of agriculture and related facilities lost as a result of the damage caused by Typhoon Megi reached approximately $4,500,000;

Whereas Typhoon Megi also struck mainland China but was by that time classified as a tropical storm; and

Whereas the response of the Government of Taiwan, the Government of the Philippines, and multiple international aid organizations was commendable in meeting the needs of the people in a timely manner: Now, therefore, be it

Resolved, That the House of Representatives—

(1) mourns the terrible loss of life caused by Typhoon Megi that occurred in October 2010, in the Asia-Pacific region;

(2) expresses its deepest condolences to the families of the many victims;

(3) recognizes the deep ties between the United States and the Republic of the Philippines and the United States and the Republic of China (Taiwan) and expresses continued solidarity with its people during this time of crisis; and

(4) expresses gratitude to the people of the United States who have generously supported those humanitarian aid agencies working to assist the people of Taiwan and the Philippines in this time of need.