There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Congratulating Gerda Weissmann Klein on being selected to receive the Presidential Medal of Freedom.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
12/15/2010Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 407 - 0 (Roll no. 637).(text: CR 12/14/2010 H8308)
12/01/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date
12/15/2010-3:16pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/15/2010-3:16pmOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 407 - 0 (Roll no. 637). (text: CR 12/14/2010 H8308)
12/15/2010-3:08pmConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8389-8390)
12/14/2010-3:20pmAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Ms. Chu objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
12/14/2010-3:11pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 1743.
12/14/2010-3:11pmConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8308-8310)
12/14/2010-3:11pmMs. Chu moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
12/01/2010Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
12/01/2010Introduced in House

Cosponsors (98)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 12/01/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 12/02/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 12/02/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/02/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 12/02/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 12/02/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 12/02/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 12/02/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 12/02/2010
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 12/02/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 12/02/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 12/02/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 12/02/2010
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 12/02/2010
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 12/02/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 12/02/2010
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 12/02/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 12/02/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 12/02/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 12/02/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 12/02/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/02/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 12/02/2010
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 12/02/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 12/02/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 12/02/2010
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 12/02/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 12/02/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 12/02/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 12/02/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 12/02/2010
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 12/02/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 12/02/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/02/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 12/02/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 12/02/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 12/02/2010
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 12/02/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 12/02/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 12/02/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 12/02/2010
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 12/02/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 12/02/2010
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 12/02/2010
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 12/02/2010
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 12/02/2010
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 12/02/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 12/02/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 12/02/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 12/02/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 12/02/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 12/02/2010
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 12/02/2010
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 12/02/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 12/02/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 12/02/2010
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 12/02/2010
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 12/02/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/02/2010
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 12/02/2010
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 12/02/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 12/02/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 12/02/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 12/02/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 12/02/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 12/02/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 12/02/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 12/02/2010
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 12/02/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 12/07/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 12/07/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 12/07/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 12/07/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 12/07/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 12/07/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 12/07/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 12/08/2010
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 12/08/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 12/08/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 12/08/2010
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 12/08/2010
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 12/08/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 12/08/2010
Rep. Djou, Charles K. [R-HI-1] 12/08/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 12/08/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 12/08/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 12/08/2010
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 12/08/2010
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 12/08/2010
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 12/08/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 12/08/2010
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 12/08/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 12/08/2010
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 12/08/2010
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 12/08/2010
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 12/08/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 12/09/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 12/09/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform12/01/2010 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.1743.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.1743. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (12/15/2010)

Congratulates Gerda Weissmann Klein on being selected to receive the Presidential Medal of Freedom.