Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 12/01/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 12/02/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 12/02/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/02/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 12/02/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 12/02/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 12/02/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 12/02/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 12/02/2010
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 12/02/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 12/02/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 12/02/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 12/02/2010
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 12/02/2010
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 12/02/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 12/02/2010
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 12/02/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 12/02/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 12/02/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 12/02/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 12/02/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/02/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 12/02/2010
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 12/02/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 12/02/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 12/02/2010
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 12/02/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 12/02/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 12/02/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 12/02/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 12/02/2010
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 12/02/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 12/02/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/02/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 12/02/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 12/02/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 12/02/2010
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 12/02/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 12/02/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 12/02/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 12/02/2010
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 12/02/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 12/02/2010
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 12/02/2010
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 12/02/2010
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 12/02/2010
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 12/02/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 12/02/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 12/02/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 12/02/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 12/02/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 12/02/2010
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 12/02/2010
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 12/02/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 12/02/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 12/02/2010
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 12/02/2010
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 12/02/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/02/2010
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 12/02/2010
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 12/02/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 12/02/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 12/02/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 12/02/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 12/02/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 12/02/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 12/02/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 12/02/2010
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 12/02/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 12/07/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 12/07/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 12/07/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 12/07/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 12/07/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 12/07/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 12/07/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 12/08/2010
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 12/08/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 12/08/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 12/08/2010
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 12/08/2010
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 12/08/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 12/08/2010
Rep. Djou, Charles K. [R-HI-1] 12/08/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 12/08/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 12/08/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 12/08/2010
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 12/08/2010
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 12/08/2010
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 12/08/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 12/08/2010
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 12/08/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 12/08/2010
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 12/08/2010
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 12/08/2010
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 12/08/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 12/09/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 12/09/2010