Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/13/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/13/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/13/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 02/13/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 02/13/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/13/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 02/24/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 02/24/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/24/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/24/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 02/24/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/24/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/24/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 02/24/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 02/25/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 02/26/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/03/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 03/03/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/05/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/05/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/09/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/10/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/11/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 03/16/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/16/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 03/23/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 03/23/2009