Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 01/06/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/07/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/08/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 01/08/2009
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 01/08/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/08/2009
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 01/08/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 01/08/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 01/09/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 01/09/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 01/09/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 01/13/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 01/13/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 01/13/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 01/13/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 01/13/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 01/13/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 01/13/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 01/13/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 01/13/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 01/13/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 01/13/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 01/13/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 01/13/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 01/13/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 01/13/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 01/13/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 01/13/2009
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 01/13/2009
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 01/13/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 01/13/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 01/13/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 01/13/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 01/13/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 01/13/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 01/13/2009
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 01/13/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 01/13/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 01/13/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/13/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 01/13/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 01/13/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 01/13/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 01/14/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 01/14/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 01/14/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 01/14/2009
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 01/15/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/15/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 01/27/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 01/27/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/03/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/03/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/03/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/23/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 02/23/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 02/23/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 02/23/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 02/23/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 02/23/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 02/23/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 02/23/2009
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45] 02/23/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 02/23/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/23/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/23/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 02/23/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/23/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 02/23/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/23/2009
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 02/23/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 02/24/2009